Financial history BIDEFORD BAPTIST PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1030741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £162.27k £148.00k £122.95k £149.02k £172.84k
Total expenditure £148.40k £141.65k £134.39k £155.73k £172.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A