TEWKESBURY YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tewkesbury young farmers undertake various activities to raise money for local charities - such as carol singing, car washing and disco's.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 December 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Belinda Sparey | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack William Harvey | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Helen Robinson | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.18k | £2.53k | £1.11k | £4.41k | £5.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.92k | £3.35k | £1.22k | £1.95k | £4.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 February 2021 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN AGRICULTURE HOME CRAFTS COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Stables
Pigeon House Farm
Eldersfield
GLOUCESTER
GL19 4NW
- Phone:
- 01452840862
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window