Trustees BARROW PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1030789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Walter Lumb Chair 25 September 2024
BARROW-UPON-HUMBER PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Suzannah Cathryn Maltas Trustee 16 March 2024
BARROW-UPON-HUMBER PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Wendy Dasey Trustee 24 January 2024
BARROW-UPON-HUMBER PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Lucy Rebecca Wright Trustee 25 August 2023
BARROW-UPON-HUMBER PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Emily Morrill Trustee 29 September 2022
BARROW-UPON-HUMBER PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Samuel Edward Stephenson Trustee 29 September 2022
BARROW-UPON-HUMBER PRESCHOOL
Recently registered
Chloe Jane Goodman Trustee 12 March 2020
BARROW-UPON-HUMBER PRESCHOOL
Recently registered