Accounts and annual returns OAKE AND BRADFORD UNDER FIVES

Charity Number: 1030799
Charity reporting is overdue by 1784 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1054 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1054 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1419 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1419 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1784 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1784 days