Accounts and annual returns GLORIOUS FAMILY INTERNATIONAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1030801
Charity reporting is up to date (257 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 12 February 2025 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 September 2023 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 April 2023 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 June 2022 375 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 June 2022 740 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required