LITTLE WONDERS PRE-SCHOOL HAVERHILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a local pre-school who offers appropriate play, education and care facilities to children and young people, whatever their race, religion, means or ability in a safe and controlled environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 December 1993: Standard registration
- HAMLET CROFT PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- HAMLET PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Ward | Chair | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colena Fuller | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cadena Smither | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA BROWN | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.71k | £151.91k | £167.07k | £179.59k | £205.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.68k | £149.51k | £164.80k | £161.33k | £201.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1992, AS AMENDED 23 MARCH 1993 AND 15 DECEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Wonders Pre School
Chalkstone Way
HAVERHILL
Suffolk
CB9 0BW
- Phone:
- 01440 710926
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window