SMARTY'S KIDS AND CARER'S GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Children/young People
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 December 1993: Standard registration
- 12 May 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | 30/04/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £475 | £320 | |
|
Total expenditure | £496 | £377 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 21 March 2005 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 NOVEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window