Financial history RAILWAY RUNABOUTS

Charity Number: 1030831
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £57.41k £62.63k £58.48k £63.55k £74.52k
Total expenditure £59.99k £53.22k £58.29k £69.17k £80.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £51.18k £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0