FURZEHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VARIOUS FUNCTIONS IE SUMMER AND XMAS FAIRS,SPONSERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Torbay
Governance
- 23 December 1993: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 September 2012: Re-registered
- FRIENDS OF FURZEHAM SCHOOL (Working name)
- FURZEHAM P T A (Working name)
- FURZEHAM COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Fensome | Chair | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.73k | £2.89k | £538 | £4.32k | £5.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.63k | £5.97k | £1.21k | £2.29k | £3.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 14 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Furzeham Primary School
Higher Furzeham Road
Brixham
TQ5 8BL
- Phone:
- 01803853347
- Website:
-
furzeham-primary.torbay.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window