HUMPTY DUMPTY PRE-SCHOOL (OAKINGTON, CAMBRIDGE)

Charity number: 1030857
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Humpty Dumpty pre-school aims to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020

Total income: £76,047
Total expenditure: £75,708

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 December 1993: Standard registration
  • 16 April 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 10 June 2015: Re-registered
  • 16 March 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HUMPTY DUMPTY PRE SCHOOL (Working name)
  • HUMPTY DUMPTY PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
  • HUMPTY DUMPTY PLAYGROUP OAKINGTON CAMBRIDGE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £59.70k £58.74k £90.45k £62.87k £76.05k
Total expenditure £54.80k £58.05k £78.83k £74.12k £75.71k
Income from government contracts £35.85k £36.45k £76.90k £52.75k N/A
Income from government grants £4.50k £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 December 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 March 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 07 February 2018 On Time