Trustees THE RED BARN COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1030875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorna Newnham Chair 27 April 2016
None on record
Louise Swan Trustee 10 January 2024
None on record
Hannah Williams Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Katy Duke Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Abbey Roberts Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Pauline Stacey Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
SAMANTHA WAY Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record