PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF FIVE WAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise various fundraising events/activities throughout the year including a well supported Summer Fayre, family events such as chocolate bingo at Easter & Christmas. Host film nights, cake bakes, fashion show evenings etc. Run end of term events such as School Discos & Non-uniform days for all year groups. Offer pre-loved uniform rail throughout the year & seasonal item pop up swap shops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £475 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 15 January 1994: Standard registration
- FIVE WAYS P T F A (Working name)
- FIVE WAYS PTFA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Winters | Chair | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Pooley | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Manjinder Nakhwal | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hackett | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Finazzo | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Gough | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Walley | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.69k | £11.51k | £7.66k | £21.78k | £22.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.19k | £5.90k | £4.37k | £17.03k | £9.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | £475 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 9 NOVEMBER 1993, 13TH SEPTEMBER 1994, 2ND OCTOBER 1995, 24 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2016 as amended on 18 Nov 2020 as amended on 12 Oct 2022 as amended on 03 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Five Ways Primary School
Langholm Drive
CANNOCK
WS12 2EZ
- Phone:
- 01543278071
- Email:
- fivewaysptfa.chair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window