THE FRIENDS OF ELLISON BOULTERS (C E CONTROLLED) SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1030889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund-Raising and Social activities for children, families and friends of the school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £13,049
Total expenditure: £8,073

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 January 1994: Standard registration
  • 20 June 2019: Funds received from 1081943 SCOTHERN KIDS CLUB
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • F E B S (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Clark Chair 06 October 2020
None on record
Jason Lyons Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Josh Antony Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Suzanne Scott Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £10.56k £18.71k £4.87k £12.27k £13.05k
Total expenditure £8.77k £15.75k £562 £7.84k £8.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 October 2021 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 November 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ellison Boulter C of E School
Sudbrooke Road
Scothern
Lincoln
LN2 2UZ
Phone:
01673862392