LAMBETH ELDERLY ASSOCIATION FROM VIETNAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide day centre facilities for Vietnamese and Chinese elderly people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 31 December 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chan Nim | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lan Hong | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kien Chu | Trustee | 06 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tuyet Truong | Trustee | 19 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dong Ngo | Trustee | 19 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
DUNG UY NGO | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
QUYEN BANH | Trustee |
|
||||||
THI THAN YEN DO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.95k | £29.51k | £17.00k | £28.12k | £38.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.49k | £25.00k | £20.18k | £28.28k | £33.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1986 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS SUFFERED BY OLDER MEMBERS OF THE VIETNAMESE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ELDERLY MEMBERS OF THE VIETNAMESE COMMUNITY WHO LIVE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH (C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH
Contact information
- Address:
-
56B COURLAND GROVE
LONDON
SW8 2PX
- Phone:
- 02074982465
- Email:
- l.eav@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window