PRESTON CHILDSPLAY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing low cost childcare to families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £133,847 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 January 1994: Standard registration
- 28 July 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1196776 PRESTON CHILDSPLAY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.43k | £160.43k | £166.47k | £173.37k | £144.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.98k | £210.98k | £191.02k | £188.77k | £119.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £146.33k | £133.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 11 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JULY 1992 AS AMENDED 29 MARCH 1993 AND 14 APRIL 2010 as amended on 12 Jun 2020 as amended on 29 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
Advance the education of children below compulsory school age by providing high quality, professional care and educational opportunities to children accessing our nursery provision. Working alongside families and carers to give practical and emotional support to help them provide the best possible home environment to promote their children’s learning and development. Working as partners, with statutory and charitable agencies, for the benefit of our children and families whilst strengthening and supporting the community cohesion.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window