Accounts and annual returns HENRY COTTON MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1030908
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2012 12 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 10 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2010 29 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2009 29 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required