Accounts and annual returns CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE CITY OF LONDON SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity number: 1030917
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 05 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 03 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 27 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 01 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 09 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 17 February 2009 17 days late