Financial history CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE CITY OF LONDON SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity number: 1030917
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £9.22k £110.13k £13.74k £12.47k £7.46k
Total expenditure £2.45k £2.49k £11.11k £11.35k £15.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A