FRIENDS OF SCHOLES PRIMARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide social events for the wider school community and raise funds to provide resources which will enhance the children's education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Leeds City
Governance
- 15 January 1994: Standard registration
- SCHOLES (ELMET) PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Wilson | Chair | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Clay | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Seymour | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mei-Ling Linda Hsiao-Hick | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77k | £5.24k | £7.24k | £10.83k | £35.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.33k | £9.34k | £2.77k | £7.44k | £28.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.50k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/1996 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O SCHOLES (ELMET) PRIMARY SCHOOL
STATION ROAD
SCHOLES
LEEDS
LS15 4BJ
- Phone:
- 0113 2649149
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window