Governing document ROYAL AIR FORCE WIDOWS ASSOCIATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/9/1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED SEPTEMBER 1997, SEPTEMBER 1999, SEPTEMBER 2003, 14/4/2010, 22/10/2012 AND 19/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED ON 15 OCT 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 OCT 2021 as amended on 02 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF QUALIFYING PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF THEIR BEREAVEMENT (INCLUDING ANY ARISING PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS) BY THE PROVISION OF FRIENDSHIP, PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AND, WHERE NECESSARY, ADVICE ON OBTAINING MEDICAL HELP OR GUIDANCE. QUALIFYING PERSONS SHALL MEAN: (1) THOSE PERSONS WHOSE DECEASED SPOUSE, ELIGIBLE PARTNER OR CIVIL PARTNER SERVED IN THE ROYAL AIR FORCE (“RAF”); (2) RAF PERSONNEL AND FORMER RAF PERSONNEL WHOSE SPOUSE, ELIGIBLE PARTNER OR CIVIL PARTNER DIED WHILST THEY WERE SERVING IN THE RAF; AND (3) DEPENDENT CHILDREN OF QUALIFYING PERSONS. AN ‘ELIGIBLE PARTNER’ IS SOMEONE WHO MEETS THE CRITERIA OF SUCH FOR PENSION PURPOSES UNDER THE MINISTRY OF DEFENCE REGULATIONS OR POLICY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.