Accounts and annual returns CLIFFE VC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1030961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 14 November 2024 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2021 16 January 2023 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 09 April 2021 283 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required