Financial history EAST SURREY TWINS CLUB

Charity number: 1030962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.24k £95 £1.70k £2.07k £5.23k
Total expenditure £2.66k £346 £2.67k £2.68k £3.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A