Financial history FINSBURY PARK HOMELESS FAMILIES PROJECT LTD

Charity Number: 1030970
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.37k £0 £0 £1.80k £0
Total expenditure £71.60k £0 £0 £1.79k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A