OLDHAM COMMUNITY ACCOUNTANCY SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent Examination of Accounts. Payroll Bureau and Training in Financial Management to other organisations in the voluntary sector of Oldham and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bury
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Wigan
Governance
- 05 January 1994: Standard registration
- 20 October 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 October 2014: Funds transferred to 1063577 VOLUNTARY ACTION OLDHAM LIMITED
- O C A S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.12k | £105.20k | £131.25k | £109.82k | £113.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.39k | £105.58k | £135.92k | £119.39k | £107.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 12 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 12 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 08 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 08 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 05 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 05 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 9 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT AND CONTROL OF OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS IN THE DIRECT PURSUIT OF THEIR OBJECTS, IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, ADVICE, ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND EVALUATIVE SERVICES
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF OLDHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window