ST MINVER GUIDES AND BROWNIES

Charity number: 1030991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To pursue the objectives of the Guide Association concerned with assisting girls and young women to fulfil their potential to take an active and responsible role in society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £337
Total expenditure: £227

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MINVER GUIDES AND BROWNIES AND RAINBOWS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LOUISE SARAH RILLSTONE Trustee
None on record
KATHERINE HORE Trustee
None on record
KAREN BARBARA BERRY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.34k £16.27k £2.68k £247 £337
Total expenditure £2.58k £2.58k £1.56k £793 £227
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £16.26k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE BUNGALOW
LITTLE BODIEVE HOUSE
BODIEVE
WADEBRIDGE
PL27 6EG
Phone:
01208815547
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available