BRIGHAM PRE-SCHOOL AND THE DEN

Charity number: 1030994
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide pre-school care for children from 2 years six months to the age of five. We also provide out of school care for children aged 3 years up to 13 including holiday schemes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012

Total income: £212,371
Total expenditure: £186,900

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1994: Standard registration
  • 16 October 2015: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BRIGHAM PLAYGROUP AND UNDER FIVES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012
Total gross income £152.06k £93.57k £172.17k £177.17k £212.37k
Total expenditure £134.33k £125.16k £156.11k £161.89k £186.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 11 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 11 March 2013 On Time