Financial history FRIENDS OF WEST JESMOND PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1030997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £22.66k £16.90k £10.12k £6.84k £13.35k
Total expenditure £22.75k £11.25k £4.69k £4.52k £1.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A