FRIENDS OF BIGGLESWADE HOSPITAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising activities to provide equipment to the hospital which benefits both the patients and the staff .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 10 January 1994: Standard registration
- 09 March 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.79k | £8.33k | £8.99k | £7.65k | £10.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.77k | £9.78k | £6.57k | £10.23k | £3.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 03 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 22 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF BIGGLESWADE HOSPITAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window