FRIENDS OF BEDFORD HOSPITAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Bedford Hospital raise funds for Hospital equipment which is badly needed but the NHS cannot afford. We run fundraising events including Hospital Stalls, Garden Visits & Teas, Amateur Dramatic evenings, Concerts, Pub Quizzes & Supermarket Collections. We gratefully accept donations from the public and from our members, who pay annual subscriptions of £10.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 10 January 1994: Standard registration
- 24 July 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 July 2019: Funds transferred to 299250 Bedford Hospital Charity and Friends
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.03k | £19.56k | £41.22k | £25.48k | £20.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.67k | £46.11k | £39.53k | £28.06k | £3.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 26 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 24 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | 24 July 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 15 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | 25 July 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 01 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF BEDFORD HOSPITAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window