Trustees LITTLE EALING PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1031052

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter James Alan Elson | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karolina Meyer | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosa Appleby Ellis | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Jackson | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexa Fereday | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Hirst | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Fergus Crockett | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily Cracknell | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Louise Lindsrom | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.