Accounts and annual returns BURROUGH GREEN PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1031074
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 22 October 2016 On Time