THE GLOVE COLLECTION TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining and displaying unique collection of historic gloves. Building collection of gloves ultimately for display to the public. Making the gloves available for the purposes of academic research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rodney James Jagelman MA FIA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Mulliner | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Marshall | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Keith Dodd BA | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
deborah moore | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Harden | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Robert Yentob FCA | Trustee |
|
||||||
Stephen Michael Brooker | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.65k | £5.52k | £8.82k | £7.98k | £10.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69k | £10.03k | £1.40k | £910 | £2.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 1 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 4 NOVEMBER 2003. as amended on 05 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORICAL, SOCIAL AND ARTISTIC VALUE OF GLOVES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Church Road
Spratton
NORTHAMPTON
NN6 8HR
- Phone:
- 07950 781661
- Email:
- jane37758@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window