Accounts and annual returns OATLANDS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1031129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 02 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 02 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 31 December 2024 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 31 December 2024 184 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 March 2023 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 February 2023 243 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 May 2022 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 February 2022 222 days late Download Open in new window