Financial history TRENT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £15.12k £8.44k £10.65k £20.09k £22.98k
Total expenditure £16.10k £14.70k £10.23k £7.78k £13.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A