Trustees BARB
Charity number: 1031263

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK NEWMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Colin Hewetson | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andy Brewer | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Young | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Kemp | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Cunningham | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Craig Dunbar | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Brewer | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LOWE | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|||||
ROGER FLOWER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM HALLSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.