Friends of Wigton Infant School

Charity number: 1031266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise money for the school and to ensure inclusion for all as the school is a community startegic facitlity for special needs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £3,096
Total expenditure: £19,224

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 January 1994: Standard registration
  • 22 March 2021: Funds received from 1139260 LONGTHWAITE ROAD PRE SCHOOL LTD
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WIGTON INFANTS' HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Crawford Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Kimberley Anne Allinson Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Katherine Jane Rudd Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.25k £94.66k £3.01k £2.99k £3.10k
Total expenditure £1.71k £6.19k £25.48k £3.91k £19.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 September 2024 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 March 2024 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WIGTON INFANT SCHOOL
LONGTHWAITE ROAD
WIGTON
CA7 9JR
Phone:
01697342649
Website:

No information available