DERBY LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money for distribution to the less fortunate people in the Derby area. We have recently supported the following activities:- Day Centre outing; Derby Child Contact Centre and food for the needy at Christmas. We are currently collecting for Action for Children, the Padley Centre and Jericho House.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Derby City
Governance
- 11 January 1994: Standard registration
- 05 August 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.25k | £8.56k | £9.34k | £9.44k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.93k | £10.56k | £8.66k | £8.91k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 09 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window