BRADWELL COMMON PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a local pre-school providing a safe, secure, fun and stimulating environment for children aged 2.5 yrs to 4 yrs to play and learn, following guidelines set by Ofsted and the EYFS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
Total income includes £93,258 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 26 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Van Dalfsen | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Burgess | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DONNA BELLHOUSE | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.21k | £74.25k | £66.52k | £65.82k | £93.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.49k | £71.60k | £81.64k | £82.98k | £84.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £67.98k | £67.58k | £66.00k | £64.92k | £93.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £900 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 09 April 2025 | 428 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 09 April 2025 | 428 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2023 | 290 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2023 | 290 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2022 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2022 | 390 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
125 BRADWELL COMMON BOULEVARD
BRADWELL COMMON
MILTON KEYNES
MK13 8DY
- Phone:
- 07785781731
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window