Accounts and annual returns KILSBY PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1031349
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 15 August 2024 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 15 August 2024 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 June 2023 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 27 June 2023 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 September 2020 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 September 2020 122 days late Download Open in new window