KILSBY PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1031349
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To enhance the development and education of children under statutory school age in a parent-involving community based group.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £92,271
Total expenditure: £97,322

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1994: Standard registration
  • 14 May 2025: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KILSBY UNDER FIVES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £89.60k £78.20k £102.04k £101.89k £92.27k
Total expenditure £79.24k £85.05k £99.83k £112.13k £97.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 15 August 2024 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 15 August 2024 76 days late
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 June 2023 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 27 June 2023 27 days late
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 September 2020 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 September 2020 122 days late
Submit annual return Open in new window