TAMAR VALLEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1031355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing care for pre-school children

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £60,523
Total expenditure: £63,092

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CALSTOCK UNDER FIVES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Trend Chair 23 January 2024
None on record
Leigh-Anne Alford Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Frances Crofts Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Jamie Boxall-Lawrence Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.53k £50.61k £60.90k £64.85k £60.52k
Total expenditure £53.89k £49.32k £55.92k £65.99k £63.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £56.26k £48.58k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Village Hall
The Quay
Calstock
PL18 9QA
Phone:
01822 834 418