PETER PAN PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1031364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provider of pre-school education for children aged 2.5 to 5.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £185,838
Total expenditure: £130,032

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carey Patricia Francis Chair 26 March 2018
None on record
Jessica Dixon Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Ella Louise Chapman Trustee 16 June 2024
None on record
Stephanie Louise Dart Trustee 16 June 2024
None on record
Danielle Charlotte Anne Siobhan Butt Trustee 26 March 2024
None on record
Ashleigh Dackombe Trustee 30 March 2023
None on record
Laurie Kirsten Morris Trustee 30 March 2022
None on record
Hannah Louise Smith Trustee 30 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £96.78k £103.10k £98.97k £93.16k £185.84k
Total expenditure £96.10k £95.59k £100.09k £117.97k £130.03k
Income from government contracts £78.11k £78.80k £73.95k £61.03k £155.14k
Income from government grants £1.18k £2.40k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 10 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 28 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 30 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Copthorne Village Hall
Copthorne Bank
Copthorne
CRAWLEY
RH10 3RE
Phone:
07745255501