Ryton-on-Dunsmore Provost Williams PTA

Charity Number: 1031374
Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provost Williams PTA charity is and has been such an integral part of the school community for many years raising thousands of pounds to improve equipment and resources to enhance the childrens education and facilities. Most popular fund raising events are the Christmas fair, Summer gala and childrens discos.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022

Total income: £200
Total expenditure: £200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 1994: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 16 October 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PROVOST WILLIAMS CE ASSOCIATION OF PARENTS AND TEACHERS (Previous name)
  • RYTON ON DUNSMORE CE (CONTROLLED) FIRST SCHOOL ASSOCIATION OF PARENTS AND TEACHERS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Jane Frances Cox Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Emily Darch Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £7.48k £4.20k £3.44k £1.01k £200
Total expenditure £2.22k £1.48k £440 £68 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 April 2024 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 31 January 2023 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 November 2021 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Provost Williams Primary School
Sodens Avenue
Ryton On Dunsmore
COVENTRY
CV8 3FF
Phone:
02476303902