Accounts and annual returns INNER WHEEL CLUB OF LINCOLN BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1031391
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 29 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2008 01 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 18 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required