LODGE OF PERSEVERANCE NO 213 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1031437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Masonic and non-Masonic Charity Support

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,713
Total expenditure: £4,282

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ivor Bartram Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record
Andrew Clutten Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record
TERENCE JAMES NICHOLL Trustee
None on record
ROBERT JOHN DAYNES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £93.37k £1.83k £46.17k £3.17k £4.71k
Total expenditure £5.66k £2.97k £255 £4.56k £4.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 Ray Bond Way
Aylsham
NORWICH
NR11 6UT
Phone:
01263732003
Website:

No information available