DENTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall to be used for the cultural, educational and social benefit of the inhabitants of the village of Denton in Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERENCE JOHN HANNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mark Stephen Richards | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Matthew Kerr | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Caroline Richards | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Julie Luton | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sida-Page | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony Grant | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Brownlie Gibson | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Hanner | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sam William Norfolk | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wilby | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stockwell Luton | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Harriet Mancroft Brown | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Fredrick Cooper | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Ruth Poulton | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Batchelor | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Ann Whiteman | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN M HANNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN P HIPWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN E WHIPPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ROBERT GODSMARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
doris lambert | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.25k | £24.48k | £19.15k | £6.42k | £9.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.46k | £25.39k | £8.78k | £8.08k | £14.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.20k | £17.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 August 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF DENTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DENTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILL FARM
DARROW GREEN ROAD
DENTON
HARLESTON
IP20 0BA
- Phone:
- 01986788352
- Email:
- d.godsmark@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window