RUBERY OWEN GROUP CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Trust is to make donations to charities at the discretion of the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 13 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leon Thomas | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Jenkins | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Cross | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.95k | £43 | £3.65k | £6.54k | £124.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.95k | £350 | £3.15k | £8.44k | £5.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Waterfront Business Park
Dudley Road
BRIERLEY HILL
West Midlands
DY5 1LX
- Phone:
- 01215263131
- Email:
- administrator@ruberyowen.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window