ST AGNES PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRE-SCHOOL CARE AND EDUCATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 26 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM TURNER | Chair | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Diane Dodson | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Luff-Cooper | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Carlyon | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Philip Knight | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALISON ROBINSON | Trustee | 24 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.38k | £211.29k | £206.14k | £270.73k | £287.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.17k | £190.07k | £211.58k | £244.89k | £271.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £99.76k | £103.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 February 2021 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
08 March 2021 | 251 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Agnes Preschool
Trelawney Road
St Agnes
Cornwall
TR5 0LZ
- Phone:
- 01872554005
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window