ST JAMES'S PLACE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1031456
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raise funds and award grants to charities operating in the UK with an annual income of less than 700K that support young people who are disadvantaged or are challenged by special needs under the age of 25 and Hospices for all ages. The restriction on annual income does not apply to Hospices or special needs schools or to mainstream schools with a special needs unit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 1994: Standard registration
  • 13 April 2012: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 13 April 2012: Funds transferred to 1144606 ST. JAMES'S PLACE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • J ROTHSCHILD ASSURANCE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
  • THE J ROTHSCHILD ASSURANCE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £1.93m £2.55m £2.63m £3.29m £2.89m
Total expenditure £2.13m £1.82m £2.97m £2.66m £3.65m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.28m £1.24m £1.79m £1.49m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £25.14k £26.55k £26.81k £27.76k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £1.47m £1.36m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £77.35k £88.32k £7.95k £9.66k
Income - Other N/A £1.17m £1.27m £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £81.54k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.78m £2.89m £2.09m £3.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £12.44k £10.37k £8.00k £8.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Own use assets N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A £2.07m £1.71m £2.47m £1.71m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £13.00k £0 £1.11m £1.11m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 27 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 27 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2009 18 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 18 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 27 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 27 October 2009 On Time