Financial history LINWOOD UNDER FIVES

Charity number: 1031511
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £81.72k £82.12k £79.48k £69.07k £83.10k
Total expenditure £110.79k £77.80k £80.47k £75.26k £76.66k
Income from government contracts £53.00k £66.12k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.32k £0 N/A N/A £5.00k